Ex 1.2, 8 (Method 1) A student multiplied 7236 by 65 instead of multiplying by 56. By how much was his answer greater than the correct answer? (Hint: Do you need to do both the multiplications?)
Wrong multiplication = 7236 × 65
Right multiplication = 7236 × 56
Difference between both answers
= 7236 × 65 − 7236 × 56
Taking 7236 common
= 7236 × (65 − 56)
= 7236 × 9
So, wrong answer was greater than right answer by 65,124.
Ex 1.2, 8 (Method 2) A student multiplied 7236 by 65 instead of multiplying by 56. By how much was his answer greater than the correct answer? (Hint: Do you need to do both the multiplications?)Wrong multiplication
= 7236 × 65
Difference between wrong answer and right answer
= 4,70,340 − 4,05,216
So, wrong answer was greater than right answer by 65,124.

Made by

Davneet Singh

Davneet Singh has done his B.Tech from Indian Institute of Technology, Kanpur. He has been teaching from the past 12 years. He provides courses for Maths, Science, Social Science, Physics, Chemistry, Computer Science at Teachoo.

Hi, it looks like you're using AdBlock :(

Displaying ads are our only source of revenue. To help Teachoo create more content, and view the ad-free version of Teachooo... please purchase Teachoo Black subscription.

Please login to view more pages. It's free :)

Teachoo gives you a better experience when you're logged in. Please login :)

Solve all your doubts with Teachoo Black!

Teachoo answers all your questions if you are a Black user!